Docket for 16-801
|
Oct 13 2016 | Application (16A367) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 24, 2016 to November 23, 2016, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | | Oct 19 2016 | Application (16A367) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until November 23, 2016. | | | Nov 10 2016 | Application (16A367) to extend further the time from November 23, 2016 to December 23, 2016, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | | Nov 14 2016 | Application (16A367) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until December 23, 2016. | | | Dec 22 2016 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 23, 2017) | | | Jan 23 2017 | Brief of respondent SF Markets, L.L.C., dba Sprouts Farmers Market filed. | | | Feb 08 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 24, 2017. | | | May 21 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/24/2018. | | | May 29 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|