Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-7667
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-7667
Title:Daniel Garcia Bello, aka Daniel Bello, aka Daniel Garcia, aka Daniel Belo, aka Daniel R. Garcia, aka Daniel Rodrigo Garcia, aka Daniel Garcia-Belo, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:January 24, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-20755)
   Decision Date:November 16, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 19 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 23, 2017)
Feb 15 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 27, 2017.
Feb 23 2017Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Mar 09 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 24, 2017.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and the petition for a writ of certiorari as to Daniel G. Bello, Fidel Flores, Jose S. Olivarez, Rudy Martinez-Castillo, Lugardo Vazquez-Hernandez, Angel D. Sanabia-Sanchez, Lino I. Carrillo-Hernandez, and Hector A. Cabrera are granted. The judgments are vacated, and the cases are remanded to the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit for further consideration in light of Sessions v. Dimaya, 584 U. S. ____ (2018). The petition for a writ of certiorari as to Genaro Mayorga-Salazar, Mario A. Amaya-Guerrero, Rudith V. Guerrero-Araniva, Tito Olvera-Castro, Carlos Trejo-Dominguez, Evaristo Reyes-Diaz, and Francisco D. Trevino-Rodriguez is denied.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Scott A. Martin
    Counsel of Record
Assistant Federal Public Defender
440 Louisiana Street
Suite 1350
Houston, TX 77002-1669

(713) 718-4600
Party name: Daniel Garcia Bello, aka Daniel Bello, aka Daniel Garcia, aka Daniel Belo, aka Daniel R. Garcia, Daniel Rodrigo Garcia, aka Daniel Garcia-Belo
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543