Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-739
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-739
Title:Scenic America, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Department of Transportation, et al.
Docketed:December 7, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-5195)
   Decision Date:September 6, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 05 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 6, 2017)
Jan 04 2017Waiver of right of respondents Department of Transportation; Anthony Fox, in his official capacity as Secretary of Transportation; Gregory G. Nadeau, in his official capacity as Acting Administrator of Federal Highway Administration; and Federal Highway Administration to respond filed.
Jan 05 2017Waiver of right of respondent Outdoor Advertising Association of America, Inc. to respond filed.
Jan 11 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017.
Jan 30 2017Response Requested. (Due March 1, 2017)
Feb 23 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 31, 2017, for all respondents.
Mar 28 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 1, 2017, for all respondents.
May 01 2017Brief of respondent Outdoor Advertising Association of America, Inc. in opposition filed.
May 01 2017Brief of Federal Respondents in opposition filed.
May 16 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 1, 2017.
May 30 2017Reply Requested. (Due June 13, 2017)
Jun 09 2017Reply of petitioner Scenic America, Inc. filed.
Jun 14 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Oct 02 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Oct 10 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017.
Oct 16 2017Petition DENIED. Statement of Justice Gorsuch, with whom The Chief Justice and Justice Alito join, respecting the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Laura Keats Wendell
    Counsel of Record
2525 Ponce de Leon Boulevard, Suite 700
Coral Gables, FL 33134

lwendell@wsh-law.com
305-854-0800
Party name: Scenic America, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Transportation; Anthony Fox, in his official capacity as Secretary of Transportation; Gregory G. Nadeau, in his official capacity as Acting Administrator of Federal Highway Administration; and Federal Highway Administration
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

kshanmugam@wc.com
(202) 434-5000
Party name: Outdoor Advertising Association of America, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543