Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-7373
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-7373
Title:John Prickett, Jr., Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 30, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3486)
   Decision Date:October 5, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 28 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 30, 2017)
Jan 25 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 1, 2017.
Feb 17 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including April 3, 2017.
Apr 03 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Apr 12 2017Reply of petitioner John Prickett, Jr. filed.
Apr 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2017.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Anna M. Williams
    Counsel of Record
Assistant Federal Public Defender
3739 Steele Blvd.
Suite 280
Fayetteville, AR 72703

anna_williams@fd.org
(479) 442-2306
Party name: John Prickett, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543