Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-7214
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-7214
Title:Oscar Virgilio Perdomo, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 15, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-40958)
   Decision Date:September 15, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 13 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 17, 2017)
Jan 10 2017Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Jan 26 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Sessions v. Dimaya, 584 U. S. ____ (2018).
Jun 15 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Scott A. Martin
    Counsel of Record
Assistant Federal Public Defender
440 Louisiana Street
Suite 1350
Houston, TX 77002-1669

(713) 718-4600
Party name: Oscar Virgilio Perdomo
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543