Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-689
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-689
Vide 16-701
Title:National Labor Relations Board, Petitioner
v.
24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc., et al.
Docketed:November 23, 2016
Linked with 16A283
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-60005)
   Decision Date:June 27, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 16 2016Application (16A283) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 25, 2016 to October 26, 2016, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Sep 21 2016Application (16A283) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until October 26, 2016.
Oct 13 2016Application (16A283) to extend further the time from October 26, 2016 to November 23, 2016, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Oct 19 2016Application (16A283) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until November 23, 2016.
Nov 23 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 23, 2016)
Dec 12 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 23, 2017, for all respondents.
Jan 17 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including February 22, 2017, for all respondents.
Feb 22 2017Brief of respondent 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Mar 07 2017Reply of petitioner National Labor Relations Board filed.
Mar 08 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 24, 2017.
May 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/24/2018.
May 29 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Edwin S. Kneedler
    Counsel of Record
Deputy Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@usdoj.gov
(202) 514-2217
Party name: National Labor Relations Board
Attorneys for Respondents
Allyson Ho
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
1717 Main Street, Suite 3200
Dallas, TX 75201-7347

allyson.ho@morganlewis.com
214-466-4180
Party name: 24 Hour Fitness USA, et al.
Allyson N. HoMorgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
1717 Main Street, Suite 3200
Dallas, TX 75201-7347

allyson.ho@morganlewis.com
(214) 466-4000
Party name: 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543