Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-6392 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-6392 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Rejon Taylor, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 12, 2016
Linked with 16A71
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(09-5517)
   Decision Date:February 11, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:May 9, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 18 2016Application (16A71) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 7, 2016 to October 6, 2016, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Jul 21 2016Application (16A71) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until October 6, 2016.
Oct 06 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 14, 2016)
Nov 09 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 14, 2016.
Dec 01 2016Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including January 13, 2017.
Dec 22 2016Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including February 13, 2017.
Feb 07 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including March 15, 2017.
Mar 07 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including April 14, 2017.
Apr 07 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 15, 2017.
May 11 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including June 14, 2017.
Jun 07 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including June 30, 2017.
Jun 30 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Jul 18 2017Reply of petitioner Rejon Taylor filed. (Distributed)
Jul 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Petition DENIED.
May 16 2018Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main Document
May 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 11 2018Rehearing DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Barry J. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Federal Capital Appellate Resource Counsel
Federal Public Defender, NDNY
39 North Pearl Street, 5th Floor
Albany, NY 12207

barry_fisher@fd.org
(518) 650-9031
Party name: Rejon Taylor
Barry J. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender, NDNY
39 North Pearl Street, 5th Floor
Albany, NY 12207

barry_fisher@fd.org
5186509031
Party name: Rejon Taylor
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543