Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-6259
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-6259
Title:Gregorio Gonzalez-Longoria, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 30, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-40041)
   Decision Date:August 5, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 29 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 31, 2016)
Oct 27 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 30, 2016.
Nov 23 2016Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Dec 08 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Petition DENIED.
May 21 2018Petition of GregorioGonzalez-Longoria for rehearing submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Lance Herman
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
440 Louisiana Street
Suite 1350
Houston, TX 77002-1056

Michael_Herman@fd.org
7137184600
Party name: GregorioGonzalez-Longoria
Michael L. HermanAssistant Federal Public Defender
440 Louisiana
Suite 1350
Houston, TX 77002-1669

(713) 718-4600
Party name: Gregorio Gonzalez-Longoria
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543