Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-617
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-617
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Marco Hernandez-Lara
Docketed:November 7, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(13-10637)
   Decision Date:March 29, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:August 9, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 07 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 7, 2016)
Dec 06 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 6, 2017.
Jan 04 2017Brief of respondent Marco Hernandez-Lara in opposition filed.
Jan 04 2017Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Marco Hernandez-Lara.
Jan 18 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
May 14 2018Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Beckles v. United States, 580 U. S. ____ (2017).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondent
Alfredo M. Morales
    Counsel of Record
Morales & Leanos
75 East Santa Clara Street
Suite 250
San Jose, CA 95113

(408) 294-5400
Party name: Marco Hernandez-Lara

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543