Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-476
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-476
Vide 16-477
Title:Christopher J. Christie, Governor of New Jersey, et al., Petitioners
v.
National Collegiate Athletic Association, et al.
Docketed:October 12, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-4546, 14-4568, 14-4569)
   Decision Date:August 9, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 07 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 14, 2016)
Oct 21 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 14, 2016.
Nov 04 2016Brief amicus curiae of Professor Ryan M. Rodenberg filed. VIDED.
Nov 14 2016Brief amicus curiae of The American Gaming Association filed. VIDED.
Nov 14 2016Brief amici curiae of West Virginia, et al. filed.
Nov 14 2016Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Dec 14 2016Brief of respondents National Collegiate Athletic Association, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Dec 27 2016Reply of petitioners Christopher J. Christie, Governor of New Jersey, et al. filed.
Dec 28 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 13, 2017.
Jan 17 2017The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 23 2017Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED.
Jun 06 2017Supplemental brief of petitioners Christopher J. Christie, Governor of New Jersey, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Jun 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017.
Jun 26 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 26, 2017.
Jun 27 2017Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in 16-477 is granted. The cases are consolidated and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Jul 07 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the Petitioner.
Jul 19 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondents. VIDED
Jul 21 2017Brief amicus curiae of Professor Ryan M. Rodenberg in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Jul 31 2017The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' briefs on the merits is extended to and including August 29, 2017. VIDED.
Jul 31 2017The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including October 16, 2017. VIDED.
Aug 29 2017Joint appendix filed. VIDED. (Statement of costs filed)
Aug 29 2017Brief of petitioners Christopher J. Christie, Governor of New Jersey, et al. filed.
Aug 29 2017Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed. VIDED.
Aug 30 2017Brief amicus curiae of Researcher John T. Holden filed. VIDED.
Sep 05 2017Brief amicus curiae of The American Gaming Association filed. VIDED.
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of National Governors Association, et al. filed.
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of West Virgina, 17 other States and the Governors of Kentucky, Maryland and North Dakota filed.
Sep 05 2017Brief amicus curiae of New Sports Economy Institute in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Law Scholars filed.
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of European Sports Security Association, et al. filed. VIDED.
Sep 05 2017Brief amicus curiae of Congressman Frank J. Pallone, Jr. filed. VIDED
Oct 06 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, December 4, 2017. VIDED.
Oct 16 2017Brief of respondents National Collegiate Athletic Association, et al. filed. VIDED.
Oct 18 2017Motion of Professor Ryan M. Rodenberg for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed. VIDED.
Oct 18 2017Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 3rd Circuit.
Oct 19 2017CIRCULATED
Oct 23 2017Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Oct 23 2017Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Oct 23 2017Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed. VIDED.
Oct 26 2017Brief amici curiae of Stop Predatory Gambling, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Nov 02 2017Record received from U.S.C.A. 3rd Circuit is electronic.
Nov 13 2017Motion of Professor Ryan M. Rodenberg for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument DENIED.
Nov 13 2017Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Nov 15 2017Reply of petitioners Christopher J. Christie, Governor of New Jersey, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2017Argued. For petitioners: Theodore B. Olson, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Paul D. Clement, Washington, D. C.; and Jeffrey B. Wall, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Theodore B. Olson
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036-5306

TOlson@gibsondunn.com
(202)-955-8668
Party name: Christopher J. Christie, Governor of New Jersey, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis, LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
202-879-5000
Party name: National Collegiate Athletic Association, et al.
Other
Jonathan F. Cohn
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin, LLP
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jfcohn@sidley.com
202-736-8000
Party name: The American Gaming Association
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Deepak Gupta
    Counsel of Record
1900 L Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

deepak@guptawessler.com
(202) 888-1741
Party name: Stop Predatory Gambling, et al.
Thomas M. Johnson Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
State Capitol, Building 1, Rm E-26
Charleston, WV 25305

TJohnson@wvago.gov
304-558-2422
Party name: West Virgina, 17 other States and the Governors of Kentucky, Maryland and North Dakota
Anita M. Moorman
    Counsel of Record
Sport Administration Program, Univ. of Louisville
SAC East, Suite 104R
Louisville, KY 40292

amm@louisville.edu
502-852-0553
Party name: Researcher John T. Holden
Christopher Eduard Pey
    Counsel of Record
FisherBroyles, LLP
445 Park Avenue, 9th Fl.
New York, NY 10022

Chris.Pey@fisherbroyles.com
646-233-2533
Party name: New Sports Economy Institute
Timothy R. Robinson
    Counsel of Record
House Committee on Energy and Commerce
2322 Rayburn House Office Bldg.
Washington, DC 20515

timothy.robinson@mail.house.gov
202-225-3641
Party name: Congressman Frank J. Pallone, Jr.
Ryan Mark Rodenberg
    Counsel of Record
Florida State University139 Chieftain Way
Tallahassee, FL 32306

rrodenberg@admin.fsu.edu
(850) 645-9535
Party name: Professor Ryan M. Rodenberg
Andrew L. Schlafly
    Counsel of Record
939 Old Chester Road
Far Hills, NJ 07931

aschlafly@aol.com
908 719 8608
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund
Jonathan Henry Sherman
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner, LLP
1401 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jsherman@bsfllp.com
202-237-9605
Party name: European Sports Security Association, et al.
Richard A. Simpson
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein, LLP
1776 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

rsimpson@wileyrein.com
(202)-719-7000
Party name: National Governors Association, et al.
William James Trunk
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber, LLP
1801 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

wtrunk@robbinsrussell.com
202-775-4500
Party name: Constitutional Law Scholars
Jonathan Calvin Wood
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
3033 Wilson Blvd., Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

jwood@pacificlegal.org
202-888-6881
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation, et al.
Elbert LinSolicitor General
Office of Attorney General
State Capitol
Building 1, Room E-26
Charleston, WV 25305

Elbert.Lin@wvago.gov
(304) 558-2021
Party name: West Virginia, et al.
Jonathan Calvin WoodPacific Legal Foundation
3033 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

jw@pacificlegal.org
(202) 888-6881
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543