Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-398
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-398
Title:Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General, Petitioner
v.
Juan Jose Miranda-Godinez
Docketed:September 27, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-71485)
   Decision Date:April 28, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:June 28, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 26 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 27, 2016)
Oct 27 2016Brief of respondent Juan Jose Miranda-Godinez filed.
Nov 15 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 2, 2016.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General
Attorneys for Respondent
Jon Wu
    Counsel of Record
Wu Jon Law Corporation
630 N. San Mateo Drive
San Mateo, CA 94401

jon@jwulaw.com
(650) 324-3524
Party name: Juan Jose Miranda-Godinez

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543