Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-334
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-334
Title:Bank Melli, Petitioner
v.
Michael Bennett, et al.
Docketed:September 15, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(13-15442, 13-16100)
   Decision Date:June 14, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 12 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 17, 2016)
Oct 12 2016Waiver of right of respondent Visa Inc.; Franklin Resources, Inc. to respond filed.
Oct 17 2016Brief of respondents Michael Bennett, et al. in opposition filed.
Nov 01 2016Reply of petitioner Bank Melli filed.
Nov 02 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 22, 2016.
Nov 18 2016Rescheduled.
Dec 07 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017.
Jan 09 2017The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. Justice Breyer took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
May 23 2017Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Jun 05 2017Supplemental brief of respondents Michael Bennett, et al. filed.
Jun 05 2017Supplemental brief of petitioner Bank Melli filed.
Jun 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017.
Jun 26 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 26, 2017.
Feb 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2018.
Feb 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.
Mar 05 2018Petition DENIED. Justice Breyer took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey A. Lamken
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 660
600 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
(202) 556-2000
Party name: Bank Melli
Attorneys for Respondents
James L. Bernard
    Counsel of Record
Strook & Strook & Lavan LLP
180 Maiden Lane
New York, NY 10038-4982

jbernard@stroock.com
(212) 806-5400
Party name: Michael Bennett, et al.
Benjamin Thomas Peele II.
    Counsel of Record
Baker & McKenzie, LLP
815 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006-0000

(202) 452-7000
Party name: Visa Inc.; Franklin Resources, Inc.
Other
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543