Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-307
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-307
Title:National Labor Relations Board, Petitioner
v.
Murphy Oil USA, Inc., et al.
Docketed:September 9, 2016
Linked with 16A112
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-60800)
   Decision Date:October 26, 2015
   Rehearing Denied:May 13, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 01 2016Application (16A112) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 11, 2016 to September 9, 2016, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Aug 10 2016Application (16A112) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until September 9, 2016.
Sep 09 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 11, 2016)
Sep 22 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 10, 2016.
Oct 11 2016Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States filed.
Oct 11 2016Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen, Inc. filed.
Nov 10 2016Brief of respondent Murphy Oil USA, Inc. in opposition filed.
Nov 30 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017.
Nov 30 2016Reply of petitioner National Labor Relations Board filed. (Distributed)
Jan 09 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 13, 2017.
Jan 13 2017Petition GRANTED The petition for a writ of certiorari in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 are granted. The cases are consolidated and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument.
Jan 25 2017The following briefing schedule is adopted: Petitioners in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 and respondents in No. 16-307 will file opening and reply briefs under the schedule set forth in Rules 25.1 and 25.3. Respondents in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 and petitioner in No. 16-307 will file response briefs under the schedule set forth in Rule 25.2. VIDED.
Feb 21 2017The time to file the joint appendix and the opening briefs is extended to and including April 28, 2017. VIDED.
Feb 21 2017The time to file the response briefs is extended to and including July 27, 2017. VIDED.
Apr 11 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or neither party from counsel for respondents filed.
Apr 13 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or neither party from counsel for respondent in support Sheila M. Hobson.
Apr 28 2017The time to file the joint appendix and the opening briefs is further extended to and including June 9, 2017. VIDED.
Apr 28 2017The time to file the response briefs is further extended to and including August 9, 2017. VIDED.
Jun 09 2017Joint appendix for Murphy Oil USA, Inc., et al. filed. (Statement of costs filed.)
Jun 09 2017Brief of Petitioner Epic Systems Corporation and Respondent Murphy Oil USA, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Jun 15 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or neither party from counsel for National Labor Relations Board.
Jun 16 2017Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of United States supporting Petitioners in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 and supporting Respondents in No. 307 filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Business Roundtable supporting Epic Systems Corp., Ernst & Young LLP, and Murphy Oil USA, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Employers Group in support of Petitioners in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 and Respondent Murphy Oil in No.16-307 filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation in support of Petitioners in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 and Respondent Murphy Oil USA, Inc. in No. 16-307 filed.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. in support of Petitioners in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 and Respondent in No.16-307 filed.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of HR Policy Association filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of International Association of Defense Counsel filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amici curiae of American Staffing Association, et al. filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Bristol Farms filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amici curiae of Mortgage Bankers Association and State Mortgage Lending Association filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed. VIDED.
Jun 16 2017Brief amici curiae of Council on Labor Law Equality, et al. filed. VIDED.
Jul 19 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, October 2, 2017. VIDED.
Aug 01 2017Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit.
Aug 08 2017Brief of respondent Sheila Hobson in support of NLRB filed.
Aug 09 2017Brief of National Labor Relations Board filed.
Aug 10 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Academy of Arbitrators filed. VIDED.
Aug 11 2017Record received from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit is electronic.
Aug 14 2017CIRCULATED.
Aug 15 2017Brief amici curiae of Ten International Labor Unions, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Statement of amici in support of motion of NLRB for divided argument filed. VIDED.
Aug 16 2017Brief amici curiae of Labor Law Professors filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Motion for divided argument filed by NLRB. VIDED.
Aug 16 2017Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed. VIDED.
Aug 16 2017Brief amici curiae of Maryland, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Brief amici curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Brief amici curiae of Main Street Alliance, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen, Inc. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Susan Fowler filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of New York Taxi Workers Alliance filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 11 2017Reply of petitioner Epic Systems Corporation and respondent Murphy Oil USA, Inc. filed. VIDED (Distributed)
Sep 25 2017Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Sep 25 2017Motion for divided argument filed by NLRB GRANTED.
Oct 02 2017Argued. For petitioners in Nos. 16-285 & 16-300: Paul D. Clement, Washington, D. C.; and Jeffrey B. Wall, Principal Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For petitioner, acting as respondent, in No. 16-307: Richard F. Griffin, Jr., Washington, D. C. For respondents in Nos. 16-285 & 16-300: Daniel R. Ortiz, Charlottesville, Va. VIDED.
Oct 03 2017Letter of NLRB regarding oral argument filed. VIDED. (Distributed)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard Francis Griffin
    Counsel of Record
National Labor Relations Board
1015 Half Street, SE
Washington, DC 20570

richard.griffin@nlrb.gov
202-273-3705
Party name: NLRB
John H. FergusonAssociate General Counsel
National Labor Relations Board
1015 Half Street SE
Washington, DC 20570-0001

john.ferguson@nlrb.gov
(202) 273-3700
Party name: National Labor Relations Board
Edwin S. KneedlerDeputy Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@usdoj.gov
(202) 514-2217
Party name: National Labor Relations Board
Attorneys for Respondents
Harold Craig Becker
    Counsel of Record
815 16th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

cbecker@aflcio.org
202-637-5000
Party name: Sheila Hobson in support
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
(202) 662-9807
Party name: Epic Systems Corporation and respondent Murphy Oil USA, Inc., et al.
Jeffrey A. SchwartzJackson Lewis P.C.
1155 Peachtree St. NE, Suite 1000
Atlanta, GA 30309-3600

jschwartz@jacksonlewis.com
(404) 525-8200
Party name: Murphy Oil USA, Inc.
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: the United States
David C. Frederick
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, PLLC
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
(202)-326-7900
Party name: Labor Law Professors
Christopher Charles Murray
    Counsel of Record
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
111 Monument Circle, Suite 4600
Indianapolis, IN 46204

Christopher.murray@odnss.com
317-916-2522
Party name: Council on Labor Law Equality, et al.
Michael Rubin
    Counsel of Record
Altshuler Berzon LLP
177 Post Street, Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94108

mrubin@altshulerberzon.com
415-421-7151
Party name: Ten International Labor Unions, et al.
David M. AxelradHorvitz & Levy LLP
3601 W. Olive Ave., 8th floor
Burbank, CA 91505-468

daxelrad@horvitzlevy.com
(818) 995-0800
Party name: DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar
Edward Fouad BerbarieLittler Mendelson, P.C.
2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 1500, Lock Box 116
Dallas, TX 75201-2931

eberbarie@littler.com
(214)-880-8100
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers, et al.
Matthew FinkinNational Academy of Arbitrators
University of Illinois College of Law
504 East Pennsylvania Avenue
Champaign, IL 61820

mfinkin@illinois.edu
217-333-3884
Party name: National Academy of Arbitrators
Stephen Andrew FogdallSchnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP
1600 Market Street Suite 3600
Philadelphia, PA 19103

sfogdall@schnader.com
(215)-751-2581
Party name: Mortgage Bankers Association and State Mortgage Lending Association
Brianne GorodConstitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202-296-6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountablility Center
Beth HeifetzJones Day
51 Louisiana Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

bheifetz@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: The Employers Group in support of Petitioners in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 and Respondent Murphy Oil in No.16-307
William M. JayGoodwin Procter LLP
901 New York Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

wjay@goodwinlaw.com
(202) 346-4000
Party name: The Business Roundtable supporting Epic Systems Corp., Ernst & Young LLP, and Murphy Oil USA, Inc.
Steven B. KatzCostangy Brook Smith & Prophete LLP
2029 Century Park East Suite 1100
Los Angeles, CA 90067

skatz@constangy.com
(310) 909-7775
Party name: Bristol Farms
Martin S. KaufmanAtlantic Legal Foundation
500 Mamaroneck Avenue, Suite 320
Harrison, NY 10528

mskaufman@atlanticlegal.org
(914) 834-3322
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
John B. LewisBaker & Hostetler LLP
Key Tower, Suite 2000
127 Public Square
Cleveland, OH 44114

jlewis@bakerlaw.com
(216) 621-0200
Party name: American Staffing Association, et al.
Thomas R. McCarthyConsovoy McCarthy Park PLLC
Antonin Scalia Law School Supreme Court
3033 Wilson Boulevard, Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
703-243-9423
Party name: Law Professors
Scott L. NelsonPublic Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
(202) 588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen, Inc.
Andrew J. PincusMayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Benjamin G. RobbinsNew England Legal Foundation
150 Lincoln Street
Boston, MA 02111-2504

benrobbins@nelfonline.org
(617) 695-3660
Party name: New England Legal Foundation
Richard A. SampWashington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

rsamp@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation in support of Petitioners in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 and Respondent Murphy Oil USA, Inc. in No. 307
Samuel Scott ShaulsonMorgan Lewis Bockius LLP
101 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10178

sshaulson@morganlewis.com
212.309.6718
Party name: HR Policy Association
Mary-Christine SungailaHaynes and Boone, LLP
600 Anton Blvd., Suite 700
Costa Mesa, CA 92626

mc.sungaila@haynesboone.com
(949) 202-3062
Party name: International Association of Defense Counsel
Adam G. UnikowskyJenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001-4412

aunikowsky@jenner.com
(202) 639-6000
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc. in support of Petitioners in Nos. 16-285 and 16-300 and Respondent in No.16-307

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543