Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-166
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-166
Title:David Harris, et al., Appellants
v.
Roy Cooper, Governor of North Carolina, et al.
Docketed:August 5, 2016
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
   Case Numbers:(1:13-cv-949)
   Decision Date:June 2, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 03 2016Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due September 6, 2016)
Sep 02 2016Brief amicus curiae of OneVirginia2021: Virginians for Fair Redistricting filed.
Sep 06 2016Motion to dismiss or affirm filed by appellees Patrick McCrory, Governor of North Carolina, et al.
Sep 06 2016Brief amicus curiae of Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law in support of neither party filed.
Sep 19 2016Opposition to appellees, motion to dismiss or affirm by appellants David Harris, et al., filed.
Sep 21 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 7, 2016.
May 22 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 25, 2017.
May 26 2017The parties are directed to file letter briefs addressing the following questions: 1) Do the appellants have standing to challenge the remedial map as a partisan gerrymander? 2) Is the District Court’s order denying the appellants’ objections to the remedial map appealable under 28 U. S. C. §1253? The letter briefs are to be filed simultaneously with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before noon, Tuesday, June 6, 2017.
May 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 1, 2017.
Jun 05 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 8, 2017.
Jun 06 2017Supplemental letter of appellants David Harris, et al., Appellants filed. (Distributed)
Jun 06 2017Supplemental letter of appellee North Carolina State Board of Elections filed. (Distributed)
Jun 12 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 15, 2017.
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018.
Jun 28 2018Adjudged to be AFFIRMED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellants
Marc E. EliasPerkins Coie LLP
700 Thirteenth Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005-3960

melias@perkinscoie.com
(202) 654-6200
Party name: David Harris, et al., Appellants
Attorneys for Appellees
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: North Carolina State Board of Elections
Thomas A. Farr
    Counsel of Record
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
4208 Six Forks Road., Suite 1100
Raleigh, NC 27609

thomas.farr@ogletreedeakins.com
(919) 787-9700
Party name: Roy Cooper, Governor of North Carolina, et al.
Other
Rex HeinkeAkin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
1999 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 600
Los Angeles, CA 90067

rheinke@akingump.com
(310) 229-1000
Party name: OneVirginia2021: Virginians for Fair Redistricting
Michael Chihpoh LiBrennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law
161 Avenue of the Americas, Floor 12
New York, NY 10013

michael.li@nyu.edu
646-292-8310
Party name: Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543