Docket for 16-1526
|
Apr 21 2017 | Application (16A1037) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 18, 2017 to June 19, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | | May 02 2017 | Application (16A1037) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 19, 2017. | | | Jun 19 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 21, 2017) | | | Jun 19 2017 | Supplemental Appendix of Celgard, LLC filed. | | | Jul 12 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 21, 2017. | | | Aug 21 2017 | Brief of respondent Joseph Matal in opposition filed. | | | Sep 05 2017 | Reply of petitioner Celgard, LLC filed. | | | Sep 06 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017. | | | Apr 24 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018. | | | Apr 30 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|