Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1498
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-1498
Title:Washington State Department of Licensing, Petitioner
v.
Cougar Den, Inc.
Docketed:June 16, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Washington
   Case Numbers:(92289-6)
   Decision Date:March 16, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 14 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 17, 2017)
Jul 13 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 16, 2017.
Jul 17 2017Brief amici curiae of The States of Idaho, et al. filed.
Jul 17 2017Brief amici curiae of Washington Oil Marketers Association, et al. filed.
Aug 16 2017Brief of respondent Cougar Den, Inc. in opposition filed.
Aug 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation filed.
Aug 29 2017Reply of petitioner Washington State Department of Licensing filed. (Distributed)
Aug 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Oct 02 2017The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 15 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
May 30 2018Supplemental brief of respondent Cougar Den, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 25 2018Petition GRANTED.
Aug 09 2018Brief of petitioner Washington State Department of Licensing filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 09 2018Joint appendix filed.
Main Document
Aug 15 2018Brief amici curiae of The Washington Oil Marketers Association and the Washington Association of Neighborhood Stores filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 16 2018Brief amici curiae of Multistate Tax Commission and Federation of Tax Administrators filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 16 2018Brief amici curiae of The States of Idaho, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 16 2018Brief amici curiae of Public Health Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 17 2018Motion for an extension of time to file respondent's brief on the merits filed.
Main Document
Aug 20 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, October 30, 2018
Aug 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file respondent's brief on the merits granted and the time is extended to and including September 17, 2018.
Sep 10 2018Record requested from the Supreme Court of Washington.
Sep 12 2018CIRCULATED
Sep 12 2018Brief amicus curiae of Sacred Ground Legal Services filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2018Brief of respondent Cougar Den, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 21 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 24 2018Brief amici curiae of Nez Perce Tribe, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2018Brief amici curiae of Confederated Tribes and Band of the Yakama Nation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Congress of American Indians filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Oct 17 2018Reply of petitioner Washington State Department of Licensing filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2018Record received from the Supreme Court of Washington is electronic and located on PACER.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noah Guzzo Purcell
    Counsel of Record
1125 Washington Street, SE
P.O. Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504-0100

noahp@atg.wa.gov
360-753-6200
Party name: Washington State Department of Licensing
Attorneys for Respondent
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6041
Party name: Cougar Den, Inc.
Mathew Lane HarringtonStokes Lawrence, P.S.
1420 Fifth Avenue, Suite 3000
Seattle, WA 98101

mlh@stokeslaw.com
2066266000
Party name: Cougar Den, Inc.
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Steven W. Strack
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 83720
Boise, ID 83720-0010

steve.strack@ag.idaho.gov
208-334-4143
Party name: The States of Idaho et al
David James Cummings
    Counsel of Record
Nez Perce Tribe, Office of Legal Counsel
P.O. Box 305, 100 Agency Rd.
Lapwai, ID 83540

djc@nezperce.org
208-843-7355
Party name: Nez Perce Tribe
Jack Warren Fiander
    Counsel of Record
Sacred Ground Legal Services
5808A Summitview Avenue
Ste. 97
Yakima, WA 98908

towtnuklaw@msn.com
5099610096
Party name: Sacred Ground Legal Services
Mark Ely Greenwold
    Counsel of Record
Campaign for Tobacco-Free Kids
1400 I Street N.W., Suite 1200
Washington, DC 20007

mgreenwold@gmail.com
2024819560
Party name: Public Health Organizations
Helen Hecht
    Counsel of Record
Multistate Tax Commission
444 N. Capitol St., NW
Ste 425
Washington, DC 20001

hhecht@mtc.gov
2026601906
Party name: Multistate Tax Commission and Federation of Tax Administrators
Ethan Andrew Jones
    Counsel of Record
Yakama Nation Office of Legal Counsel
P.O. Box 151, 401 Fort Road
Toppenish, WA, WA 98948

ethan@yakamanation-olc.org
5098657268
Party name: Confederated Tribes and Band of the Yakama Nation
Virginia Anne Seitz
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

vseitz@sidley.com
202-736-8000
Party name: National Congress of American Indians
Clay R. SmithDeputy Attorney General
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 83720-0010
Boise, ID 83720-0010

clay.smith@ag.idaho.gov
(208) 334-2400
Party name: The States of Idaho, et al.
Philip Albert TalmadgeTalmadge Firzpatrick Tribe
2775 Harbor Avenue, SW
Third Floor, Suite C
Seattle, WA 98126

phil@tal-fitzlaw.com
(206) 574-6661
Party name: Washington Oil Marketers Association, et al.
Philip Albert Talmadge
    Counsel of Record
2775 Harbor Avenue SW
Third Floor, Suite C
Seattle, WA 98126

phil@tal-fitzlaw.com
2065746661
Party name: The Washington Oil Marketers Association and the Washington Association of Neighborhood Stores

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543