Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1487
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-1487
Title:Suture Express, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Owens & Minor Distribution, Inc., et al.
Docketed:June 13, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3065)
   Decision Date:March 14, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 09 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 13, 2017)
Jun 29 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 14, 2017.
Jul 12 2017Brief amici curiae of Law Professors and Scholars filed.
Aug 14 2017Brief of respondents Owens & Minor Distribution, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Aug 29 2017Reply of petitioner Suture Express, Inc. filed.
Aug 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Oct 02 2017Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sanford I. Weisburst
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Avenue, 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10010

sandyweisburst@quinnemanuel.com
(212) 849-7000
Party name: Suture Express, Inc.
Sanford Ian Weisburst
    Counsel of Record
51 Madison Ave., 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10010

sandyweisburst@quinnemanuel.com
(212)-849-7000
Party name: Suture Express, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
(202)-879-3939
Party name: Owens & Minor Distribution, Inc., et al.
Other
David A. BaltoLaw Offices of David A. Balto
1325 G Street, NW, Suite 500
suite 850
Washington, DC 20005

david.balto@dcantitrustlaw.com
(202) 577-5424
Party name: Law Professors and Scholars

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543