Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1480
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-1480
Title:Rebecca Hill, et al., Petitioners
v.
Service Employees International Union, Healthcare Illinois, Indiana, Missouri, Kansas, et al.
Docketed:June 13, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-2327)
   Decision Date:March 9, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 06 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 13, 2017)
Jun 21 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioners.
Jun 26 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondents Michael Hoffman, in his official capacity as the Acting Director of the Illinois Department of Central Management Services, et al.
Jul 06 2017Waiver of right of respondents Michael Hoffman, as Acting Director of Illinois Department of Central Management Services, et al. to respond filed.
Jul 06 2017Waiver of right of respondents SEIU Healthcare Illinois, Indiana, Missouri, Kansas to respond filed.
Jul 11 2017Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Jul 13 2017Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Jul 13 2017Brief amici curiae of Center on National Labor Policy, Inc., et al. filed.
Jul 13 2017Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Jul 26 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Aug 04 2017Response Requested. (Due September 5, 2017)
Aug 28 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 5, 2017, for all respondents.
Oct 05 2017Brief of respondents Michael Hoffman and James Dimas in opposition filed.
Oct 05 2017Brief of respondents SEIU Healthcare Illinois, et al. in opposition filed.
Oct 24 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2017.
Oct 24 2017Reply of petitioners Rebecca Hill, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Nov 13 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
William L. Messenger
    Counsel of Record
c/o National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
8001 Braddock Road, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160

wlm@nrtw.org
(703)-321-8510
Party name: Rebecca Hill, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Frank H. Bieszczat
    Counsel of Record
Attorney General, State of Illinois
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

fbieszczat@atg.state.il.us
(312) 814-2234
Party name: Michael Hoffman, as Acting Director of Illinois Department of Central Management Services, et al.
David Leigh Franklin
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General State of Illinois
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

(312)-814-5376
Party name: Michael Hoffman, as Acting Director of Illinois Department of Central Management Services, et al.
Scott A. Kronland
    Counsel of Record
Altshuler Berzon, LLP
177 Post Street
Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94108

skronland@altber.com
415-421-7151
Party name: SEIU Healthcare Illinois, et al.
Other
Michael Ernest AvakianCenter on National Labor Policy, Inc.
5211 Port Royal Road, Suite 610
North Springfield, VA 22151

mavakian@nationallaborpolicy.org
(703) 321-9180
Party name: Center on National Labor Policy, Inc., et al.
Anthony T. CasoCenter for Constitutional Jurisprudence
c/o Dale E. Fowler School of Law at Chapman University
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
(714) 628-2666
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Andrew M. GrossmanBaker & Hostetler LLP
Washington Sq., Suite 1100
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

agrossman@bakerlaw.com
(202)-861-1697
Party name: Cato Institute, et al.
Deborah J. La FetraPacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

dlafetra@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543