Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1464
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-1464
Title:In Re Renee Bailey, et al., Petitioners
Docketed:June 7, 2017
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 26 2017Petition for a writ of mandamus filed. (Response due July 7, 2017)
Jun 22 2017Waiver of right of respondent to respond filed.
Jun 28 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Oct 02 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mark Small
    Counsel of Record
8510 Evergreen Avenue, Suite 104
Indianapolis, IN 46240

marksmaII2001@yahoo.com
(317) 252-4800
Party name:
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name:

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543