Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1454
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-1454
Title:Ohio, et al., Petitioners
v.
American Express Company, et al.
Docketed:June 6, 2017
Linked with 16A923
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1672)
   Decision Date:September 26, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:January 5, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 22 2017Application (16A923) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 5, 2017 to May 5, 2017, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Mar 24 2017Application (16A923) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until May 5, 2017.
Apr 20 2017Application (16A923) to extend further the time from May 5, 2017 to June 2, 2017, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Apr 24 2017Application (16A923) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until June 2, 2017.
Jun 02 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 6, 2017)
Jun 13 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for State petitioners Ohio, Connecticut, Idaho, Illinois, Iowa, Maryland, Michigan, Montana, Rhode Island, Utah and Vermont.
Jun 16 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the respondent Texas.
Jun 19 2017Waiver of right of respondent State of Tennessee to respond filed.
Jun 22 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondent United States.
Jun 22 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondents American Express Company, et al.
Jun 22 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or neither party, received from counsel for respondent State of Arizona.
Jun 23 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondent State of Nebraska.
Jun 26 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondent State of Missouri.
Jun 28 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 7, 2017, for all respondents.
Jul 06 2017Order further extending time to file the response of American Express Company, et al. to petition to and including August 21, 2017.
Jul 06 2017Brief amici curiae of Ahold U.S.A., Inc., et al. filed.
Jul 06 2017Brief amici curiae of John M. Connor, et al. filed.
Jul 06 2017Brief amicus curiae of Discover Financial Services filed.
Jul 06 2017Brief amicus curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. filed.
Jul 06 2017Brief amici curiae of Former Federal Antitrust Officials filed.
Jul 06 2017Brief amicus curiae of Southwest Airlines Co. filed.
Jul 06 2017Brief amicus curiae of United States Public Interest Research Group Education Fund, Inc. filed.
Jul 06 2017Brief amici curiae of 25 Professors of Antitrust law filed.
Aug 07 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Aug 21 2017Brief of respondent American Express Company in opposition filed.
Sep 05 2017Reply of petitioner Ohio, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Oct 02 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Oct 10 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017.
Oct 16 2017Petition GRANTED.
Oct 24 2017Blanket Consent filed by petitioners Ohio, et al.
Nov 01 2017The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including December 7, 2017.
Nov 01 2017The time to file respondents' briefs on the merits is extended to and including January 16, 2018.
Nov 13 2017Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, United States
Blanket Consent
Nov 21 2017Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, American Express Co., et al.
Blanket Consent
Nov 21 2017Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, State of Missouri
Blanket Consent
Dec 07 2017Brief of respondent United States in support of petitioners filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Dec 07 2017Joint appendix filed.
Main Document
Dec 07 2017Brief of petitioners Ohio, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 12 2017Consent to the filing of amicus briefs received from counsel for State of Tennessee submitted.
Blanket Consent
Dec 13 2017Consent to the filing of amicus briefs received from counsel for State of Nebraska submitted.
Blanket Consent

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Eric E. Murphy
    Counsel of Record
30 East Broad Street
17th Floor
Columbus, OH 43215

eric.murphy@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
(614)-466-8980
Party name: Ohio, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Nancy Bonnell
    Counsel of Record
Antitrust Unit Chief
Office of the Arizona Attorney General
1275 West Washington Street
Phoenix, AZ 85007-2926

Nancy.Bonnell@azag.gov
(602) 542-7728
Party name: State of Arizona
Evan R. Chesler
    Counsel of Record
Cravth, Swaine & Moore, LLP
825 Eighth Avenue
New York, NY 10019

echesler@cravath.com
212-474-1000
Party name: American Express Co., et al.
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
David Andrew Lopez
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Nebraska Attorney General
2115 State Capitol
Lincoln, NE 68509

dave.lopez@nebraska.gov
402-471-2682
Party name: State of Nebraska
Joseph Schlotzhauer
    Counsel of Record
Assistant Attorney General
Missouri Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 861
St. Louis, MO 63188

Joseph.Schlotzhauer@ago.mo.gov
314 340-7945
Party name: State of Missouri
Joseph F. Whalen
    Counsel of Record
Associate Solicitor General
500 Charlotte Avenue
Nashville, TN 37243

joe.whalen@ag.tn.gov
(615) 741-3499
Party name: State of Tennessee
David M. AshtonAssistant Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711-2548

david.ashton@texasattorneygeneral.gov
512-463-2100
Party name: State of Texas
Douglas J. PetersonAttorney General
Office of Attorney General
2115 State Capitol Building
Lincoln, NE 68509

collinkessner@nebraska.gov
402-471-3297
Party name: State of Nebraska
Other
Richard Alan ArnoldKenny Nachwalter, P.A.
1441 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1100
Miami, FL 33131

rarnold@knpa.com
(305) 373-1000
Party name: Ahold U.S.A., Inc., et al.
Anthony J. BologneseBolognese & Associates, LLC
1500 JFK Boulevard, Suite 320
Philadelphia, PA 19102

abolognese@bolognese-law.com
(215) 814-6750
Party name: John M. Connor, et al.
Eric F. CitronGoldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

ec@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: 25 Professors of Antitrust law
Debra L. GreenbergerEmery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady, LLP
600 Fifth Avenue, 10th Floor
New York, NY 10020

dgreenberger@ecbalaw.com
(212)-763-5000
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc.
Deepak GuptaGupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW.
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

deepak@guptawessler.com
(202) 888-1741
Party name: Former Federal Antitrust Officials
Elizabeth Petrela PapezWinston & Strawn, LLP
1700 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

epapez@winston.com
(202) 282-5000
Party name: Discover Financial Services
Russell S. PostBeck, Redden, L.L.P.
1221 McKinney St., Ste. 4500
Houston, TX 77010

rpost@beckredden.com
(713) 951-3700
Party name: Southwest Airlines Co.
Sharon K. RobertsonCohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
88 Pine Street, 14th Floor
New York, NY 10005

srobertson@cohenmilstein.com
212 838 7797
Party name: United States Public Interest Research Group Education Fund, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543