Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1451
RSS Feed Print
No. 16-1451
Title:United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America Local 3047, et al., Petitioners
v.
Hardin County, Kentucky, et al.
Docketed:June 6, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-5246)
   Decision Date:November 18, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:March 6, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 02 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 6, 2017)
Jun 21 2017Waiver of right of respondents Hardin County, Kentucky, et al. to respond filed.
Jul 05 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Jul 19 2017Response Requested. (Due August 18, 2017)
Aug 18 2017Brief of respondents Hardin County, Kentucky,et al., in opposition filed.
Aug 22 2017Reply of petitioners United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America Local 3047, et al. filed.
Aug 23 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Oct 02 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
James B. Coppess
    Counsel of Record
815 Sixteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

jcoppess@aflcio.org
202-637-5337
Party name: United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America Local 3047, et al.
James B. Coppess
    Counsel of Record
American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations
815 Sixteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

jcoppess@aflcio.org
(202) 637-5337
Party name: United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America Local 3047, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
John T. Lovett
    Counsel of Record
Frost, Brown, Todd, LLC
400 West Street, 32nd Floor
Lousiville, KY 40202-3363

(502) 568-0263
Party name: Hardin County, Kentucky, et al.
John T. Lovett
    Counsel of Record
Frost, Brown, Todd, LLC400 West Street, 32nd Floor
Lousiville, KY 40202-3363

(502) 568-0263
Party name: KY Hardin County, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543