Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1449
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-1449
Title:DirecTV, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Marlon Hall, et al.
Docketed:June 6, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1857, 15-1858)
   Decision Date:January 25, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:March 6, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 05 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 6, 2017)
Jun 16 2017Waiver of right of respondents Marlon Hall, et al. to respond filed.
Jun 21 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioners.
Jul 05 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Jul 06 2017Brief amicus curiae of Equal Employment Advisory Council filed. (Distributed)
Jul 06 2017Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Jul 06 2017Brief amici curiae of American Hotel & Lodging Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Jul 06 2017Brief amicus curiae of Council on Labor Law Equality filed. (Distributed)
Sep 20 2017Response Requested. (Due October 20, 2017)
Sep 25 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 20, 2017.
Nov 20 2017Brief of respondents Marlon Hall, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 05 2017Reply of petitioners DirecTV, LLC, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 08 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Evan Mark Tager
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

etager@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: DirecTV, LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael Terence Kirkpatrick
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street NW
Washington, DC 20009

mkirkpatrick@citizen.org
(202) 588-7728
Party name: Marlon Hall, et al.
Other
Allyson N. HoMorgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
1717 Main Street, Suite 3200
Dallas, TX 75201-7347

allyson.ho@morganlewis.com
(214) 466-4000
Party name: Council on Labor Law Equality
Thomas Michael O'Connell II.Best Best & Krieger, LLP
300 South Grand Avenue, 25th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

thomas.oconnell@bbklaw.com
951-826-8337
Party name: American Hotel & Lodging Association, et al.
Danny E. PetrellaNT Lakis, LLP
1501 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20005

dpetrella@ntlakis.com
(202) 629-5600
Party name: Equal Employment Advisory Council
Edward Michael RossmanJones Day
77 West Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60601

emrossman@jonesday.com
(312) 269-4305
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543