Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1436
RSS Feed Print
No. 16-1436
Title:Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al., Petitioners
v.
International Refugee Assistance Project, et al.
Docketed:June 2, 2017
Linked with 16A1190, 17A132
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1351)
   Decision Date:May 31, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 01 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed.
Jun 01 2017Application (16A1190) for a stay pending the disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Jun 02 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the Petitioner.
Jun 02 2017The respondents are directed to file a response to the petition for a writ of certiorari on or before 3 p.m., Monday, June 12, 2017.
Jun 02 2017Response to application due on or before 3 p.m., Monday, June 12, 2017.
Jun 02 2017Application (16A1190) referred to the Court.
Jun 05 2017Brief amici curiae of The States of Texas, et al. filed.
Jun 09 2017Brief amici curiae of Public Policy Legal Institute, et al. filed.
Jun 09 2017Brief amicus curiae of T.A. in support of respondent filed.
Jun 09 2017Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amici brief filed by Association of American Medical Colleges and Others in support of respondents.
Jun 09 2017Motion (16A1191) for leave to file amici brief filed by American Center for Law and Justice in support of petitioners.
Jun 09 2017Brief amici curiae of Association of American Medical Colleges and Others in support of respondents filed.
Jun 09 2017Brief amicus curiae of Susan Abeles in support of neither party filed.
Jun 09 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice in support of petitioners filed.
Jun 09 2017Motion (16A1190) for leave to file amicus brief filed by American Center for Law and Justice in support of petitioners.
Jun 10 2017Brief amicus curiae of David Boyle in support neither party filed.
Jun 12 2017Brief of respondents International Refugee Assistance Project, et al. in opposition filed.
Jun 12 2017Response to application from respondents International Refugee Assistance Project, et al. filed.
Jun 12 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Citizens United, et al. in support of petitioners.
Jun 12 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty in support of neither party.
Jun 12 2017Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
Jun 12 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Constitutional Law Scholars in support of respondents.
Jun 12 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The States of New York, et al. in support of respondents.
Jun 12 2017Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amicus brief filed by Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund, Inc. in support of petitioners.
Jun 12 2017Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amicus brief filed by The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty in support of neither party.
Jun 12 2017Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amici brief filed by The States of Virginia, et al.in opposition to the stay applications.
Jun 12 2017Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund, Inc. filed in support of petitioners.
Jun 12 2017Motion (16A1190) for leave to file amici brief filed by Citizens United, et al.
Jun 12 2017Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amici brief filed by Interfaith Group of Religious and Interreligious Organizations.
Jun 12 2017Motion (16A1191) for leave to file amicus brief filed by American Professional Society on the Abuse of Children in support of respondents.
Jun 12 2017Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amici brief by Former National Security Officials in support of respondents.
Jun 12 2017Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amici brief filed by Constitutional law scholars in support respondents.
Jun 12 2017Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amici brief filed Former National Security Officials in support respondents.
Jun 12 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Immigration Reform Law Institute.
Jun 14 2017Reply of petitioners Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed.
Jun 14 2017Reply of applicants Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed.
Jun 20 2017Supplemental brief of respondents International Refugee Assistance Project, et al. filed.
Jun 24 2017Letter of respondents International Refugee Assistance Project, et al. received. (Distributed)
Jun 25 2017Letter of petitioners Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. received. (Distributed)
Jun 26 2017Application (16A1190) and application (16A1191) are GRANTED IN PART. In addition, application (16A1191) is treated as a petition for a writ of certiorari. The petitions for writs of certiorari in 16-1436 and 16-1540 are GRANTED and the cases are consolidated for argument. In addition to the issues identified in the petitions, the parties are directed to address the following question: "Whether the challenges to Sec. 2(c) became moot on June 14, 2017." Justice Thomas, with whom Justice Alito and Justice Gorsuch join, concurring in part and dissenting in part. Opinion per curiam. (Detached Opinion). VIDED.
Jun 26 2017The due dates for the briefs on the merits in 16-1436 and 16-1540 are as provided for by Rule 25 of the Rules of this Court. VIDED.
Jun 27 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Immigration Reform Law Institute GRANTED.
Jun 27 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Citizens United, et al. GRANTED.
Jun 27 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by The States of New York, et al. GRANTED.
Jun 27 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Constitutional Law Scholars GRANTED.
Jun 27 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty GRANTED.
Jul 17 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or neither party from counsel for the petitioners. VIDED
Jul 19 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, October 10, 2017. VIDED.
Jul 26 2017Application (17A132) of Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. to file a consolidated petitioners' brief on the merits and a consolidated reply brief on the merits in excess of the word limits, submitted to The Chief Justice. VIDED.
Jul 31 2017Application (17A132) granted by The Chief Justice to file a consolidated petitioners' brief on the merits and a consolidated reply brief on the merits in excess of the word limits. VIDED.
Aug 01 2017Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 4th Circuit.
Aug 03 2017Brief amici curiae of Public Policy Legal Institute and Center for Competitive Politics in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Aug 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Criminal Justice Legal Foundation in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Aug 10 2017Joint appendix filed (3 volumes). VIDED.
Aug 10 2017Brief of petitioners Trump, President of U.S., et al. filed. VIDED.
Aug 14 2017CIRCULATED..
Aug 15 2017Brief amicus curiae of Professor Victor Williams filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Motion for enlargement of time for oral argument and for divided argument filed by respondents. VIDED.
Aug 17 2017Brief amici curiae of Texas, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Foundation for Moral Law. VIDED.
Aug 17 2017Brief amici curiae of Hardwired Global, et al. in support of neither party filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Brief amicus curiae of Becket Fund for Religious Liberty in support of neither party filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Civil Rights Union filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Brief amicus curiae of Zionist Organization of America filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Brief amici curiae of National Security Experts Andrew C. McCarthy, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Mormon History & Law in support of neither party filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Brief amici curiae of Citizens United, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Brief amici curiae of American Legislators in Support of Judicial Restraint filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 22 2017Brief amicus curiae of Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 24 2017Further consideration of the motion of respondents Hawaii, et al. to add John Doe as a party to 16-1540 is deferred to the hearing of the case on the merits. VIDED.
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of Interfaith Coalition filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 06 2017Brief amicus curiae of T.A., a United States Citizen of Yemeni Descent filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of National CIS Council 119 filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 08 2017Brief amici curiae of Chicago, Los Angeles, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 08 2017Motion to add Mohamad Mashta and Grannaz Amirjamshidi as parties filed by respondents Int'l Refugee Assistance, et al.
Sep 09 2017Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 11 2017Brief of respondents Int'l Refugee Assistance, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 12 2017Brief amici curiae of International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 13 2017Brief amicus curiae of Freedom from Religion Foundation filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 13 2017Brief amici curiae of Civil Rights Organizations filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 13 2017Brief amicus curiae of David Boyle filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 13 2017Brief amicus curiae of Decalogue Society of Lawyers filed. (Distributed)
Sep 14 2017Brief amici curiae of Anti-Defamation League, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 14 2017Brief amicus curiae of Japanese American Citizens League filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 14 2017Brief amicus curiae of Khizr Khan filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 14 2017Brief amici curiae of 37 Appellate Lawyers filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 15 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Jewish Committee filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 15 2017Brief amicus curiae of KARAMAH filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 15 2017Brief amici curiae of Episcopal Bishops filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of International Labor Organizations filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Law Scholars Gabriel "Jack" Chin, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Federal Jurisdiction filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of States of New York, et al., filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Professors of Federal Courts Jurisprudence, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of The Foundation for the Children of Iran, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Law Scholars Corey Brettschneider, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Pars Equality Center, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Tahirih Justice Center, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amicus curiae of Port of Seattle filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Colleges and Universities filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Members of the Clergy, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amicus curiae of American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Immigration, Family, and Constitutional Law Professors filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Professional Society on the Abuse of Children filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of 161 Technology Companies filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Karen Korematsu, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amicus curiae of International Lawyers for International Law filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Association of Art Museum Directors, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of PEN American Center, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Social Science Scholars filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of American Council on Education, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Muslim Justice League, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Human Rights First, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Immigration Equality, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Former National Security Officials filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amicus curiae of Massachusetts Technology Leadership Council, Inc. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of The Association of American Medical Colleges, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Certain Immigrant Rights Organizations filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Executive Branch Officials filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Refugee Organizations filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Interfaith Group of Religious and Interreligous Organizations filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amicus curiae of Syrian Asylee Ahmad M. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Education Association filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Immigration Law Scholars filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of The National Asian Pacific American Bar Association, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amicus curiae of New York University filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Advocates for Human Rights, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Hussam Ayloush, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Howard University School of Law Civil Rights Clinic, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Janet A. Napolitano and other Former Federal Immigration Officials filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 19 2017Response to motion of respondents to add Mohamad Mashta and Grannaz Amirjamshidi as parties filed from petitioners Trump, President of U.S., et al. filed.
Sep 24 2017Letter of petitioners Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. received. (Distributed). VIDED
Sep 25 2017The parties are directed to file letter briefs addressing whether, or to what extent, the Proclamation issued on September 24, 2017, may render cases No. 16-1436 and 16-1540 moot. The parties should also address whether, or to what extent, the scheduled expiration of Sections 6(a) and 6(b) of Executive Order No. 13780 may render those aspects of case No. 16-1540 moot. The briefs, limited to 10 pages, are to be filed simultaneously with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before noon, Thursday, October 5, 2017. The cases are removed from the oral argument calendar, pending further order of the Court. VIDED
Oct 04 2017Reply of petitioners Donald J. Trump, President of United States, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Oct 05 2017Supplemental brief of petitioners Trump, President of U.S., et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Oct 05 2017Supplemental brief of respondents Int'l Refugee Assistance, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 10 2017We granted certiorari in this case to resolve a challenge to “the temporary suspension of entry of aliens abroad under Section 2(c) of Executive Order No. 13,780.” Because that provision of the Order “expired by its own terms” on September 24, 2017, the appeal no longer presents a “live case or controversy.” Burke v. Barnes, 479 U. S. 361, 363 (1987). Following our established practice in such cases, the judgment is therefore vacated, and the case is remanded to the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit with instructions to dismiss as moot the challenge to Executive Order No. 13,780. United States v. Munsingwear, Inc., 340 U. S. 36, 39 (1950). We express no view on the merits. Justice Sotomayor dissents from the order vacating the judgment below and would dismiss the writ of certiorari as improvidently granted. .

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Trump, President of U.S., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Omar Cassim Jadwat
    Counsel of Record
125 Broad Street
18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

ojadwat@aclu.org
(212) 549-2500
Party name: Int'l Refugee Assistance, et al.
Neal Kumar KatyalHogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
(202) 637-5600
Party name: Hawaii, et al.
Other
Bruce D. Abramson
    Counsel of Record
University of Baltimore School of Law
1420 North Charles Street
Baltimore, MD 22101

gdolin@ubalt.edu
410-837-4610
Party name: Hardwired Global, et al.
Amir Hatem Mahdy Ali
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange
MacArthur Justice Center
718 7th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

amir.ali@macarthurjustice.org
(202) 869-3434
Party name: Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center
Deborah E. Anker
    Counsel of Record
Harvard Immigration and Refugee Clinical Program
Harvard Law School 3106 Wasserstein Hall
6 Everett Street
Cambridge, MA 02138

danker@law.harvard.edu
617 384 8165
Party name: Immigration Law Scholars
Mark A. Aronchick
    Counsel of Record
Hangley, Aronchick, Segal, Pudlin & Schiller
One Logan Square, 27th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103

maronchick@hangley.com
215-568-6200
Party name: Immigration, Family, and Constitutional Law Professors
Hilarie Bass
    Counsel of Record
American Bar Association
321 N. Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60610

abapresident@americanbar.org
312 988 5000
Party name: American Bar Association
Lynne Bernabei
    Counsel of Record
Bernabei & Kabat, PLLC
1400 - 16th Street, N.W., Suite 500
Washington, DC 20036-2223

Bernabei@Bernabeipllc.com
202.745.1942
Party name: Civil Rights Organizations
Elizabeth Ann Berney
    Counsel of Record
633 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10017

liz@zoa.org
212-481-1500
Party name: Zionist Organization of America
Richard Douglas Bernstein
    Counsel of Record
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
1875 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

rbernstein@willkie.com
202-303-1000
Party name: T.A., a United States Citizen of Yemeni descent
Charles A. Bird
    Counsel of Record
4182 Ingalls Street
San Diego, CA 92103

birdamicus17@gmail.com
619-699-2406
Party name: 37 Appellate Lawyers
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

lisa.blatt@apks.com
(202)-942-5000
Party name: Pars Equality Center, et al.
David Christopher Boyle
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 15143
Long Beach, CA 90815

dbo@boyleslaw.org
(734)-904-6132
Party name: David Boyle
Richard P. Bress
    Counsel of Record
Latkins & Watkins, LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

richard.bress@lw.com
202-637-2200
Party name: Refugee Organizations
Daniel L. Brown
    Counsel of Record
Sheppard, Mullin, LLP
30 Rockefeller Plaza
New York, NY 10112

dlbrown@sheppardmullin.com
212-634-3095
Party name: KARAMAH
George Eric Brunstad
    Counsel of Record
Dechert, LLP
90 State House Square
Hartford, CT 06013

eric.brunstad@dechert.com
(860)-524-3999
Party name: Human Rights First, et al.
Matthew James Clark
    Counsel of Record
Foundation For Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

matt@morallaw.org
334-262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
William Spencer Consovoy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
3033 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

will@consovoymccarthy.com
703-243-9423
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
Robert Lawrence Corn-Revere
    Counsel of Record
1919 Pennsylvania Ave., NW,
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20006

202-973-4200
Party name: Pen American Center, et al.
Alina Das
    Counsel of Record
Washington Square Legal Services
245 Sullivan Street
5th Floor
New York, NY 10012

alina.das@nyu.edu
(212)-998-6467
Party name: Advocates for Human Rights, et al.
Walter Dellinger
    Counsel of Record
Duke School of Law
210 Science Drive
Durham, NC 27707-0000

wdellinger@omm.com
202-383-5319
Party name: Japanese American Citizens League
Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
    Counsel of Record
Deutsch Hunt, PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave., NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

rdeutsch@deutschhunt.com
(202-868-6915
Party name: Federal Courts and Federal Indian Law Scholars
Curtis F. J. Doebbler
    Counsel of Record
85 Broad Street, 27th floor
New York, NY 10004

curtis@doebbler.net
6466005470
Party name: International Lawyers for International Law
John Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law, One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
334-262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Muhammad Usman Faridi
    Counsel of Record
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

mfaridi@pbwt.com
212-336-2000
Party name: National CIS Council 119
Aaron Xavier Fellmeth
    Counsel of Record
Sandra Day O'Connor College of Law, Mail Code 9520
Arizona State Univ., 111 E. Taylor St.
Phoenix, AZ 85004-4467

aaron.fellmeth@asu.edu
(480)-727-8575
Party name: International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations
Jerrold Joseph Ganzfried
    Counsel of Record
Ganzfried Law
5335 Wisconsin Avenue, NW Suite 440
Washington, DC 20015

JJG@ganzfriedlaw.com
(202) 486-2004
Party name: Bankruptcy Law Professors, et al.
Chad Ian Golder
    Counsel of Record
Munger Tolles & OLson, LLP
1155 F Street, NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

chadgolder@mto.com
202-220-1100
Party name: American Council on Education, et al.
Eric James Gorman
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, LLP
155 North Wacker Drive
Suite 2800
Chicago, IL 60606

eric.gorman@skadden.com
312 407 0700
Party name: Immigration Equality, et al.
Michael Julian Gottlieb
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
5301 Wisconsin Ave., N.W.
1401 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20005

mgottlieb@bsfllp.com
2022372727
Party name: Janet A. Napolitano and other Former Federal Immigration Officials
Christopher J. Hajec
    Counsel of Record
Immigration Reform Law Institute
25 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Suite 335
Washington, DC 20001

chaiec@irli.org
202-232-5590
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute
John B. Harris
    Counsel of Record
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, P.C.
488 Madison Avenue
New York, NY 10022

jharris@fkks.com
212-705-4823
Party name: Anti-Defamation League, et al.
Lindsay C. Harrison
    Counsel of Record
Jenner and Block, LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

lharrison@jenner.com
(202)-639-6000
Party name: Colleges and Universities
Christopher Ryan Hart
    Counsel of Record
Foley Hoag LLP
155 Seaport Boulevard
Boston, MA 02210

chart@foleyhoag.com
617 832 1000
Party name: Massachusetts Technology Leadership Council, Inc.
Marc Andrew Hearron
    Counsel of Record
Morrison Foester, LLP
2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 6000
Washington, DC 20006

mhearron@mofo.com
202-778-1663
Party name: Interfaith Group of Religious and Interreligous Organizations
Thomas G. Hungar
    Counsel of Record
Office of the General Counsel
U.S. House of Representatives
219 Cannon Building
Washington, DC 20515

Thomas.Hungar@mail.house.gov
(202) 225-9700
Party name: U.S. House of Representatives
Aziz Huq
    Counsel of Record
University of Chicago
1111 E. 60th Street
Chicago, IL 60622

huq@uchicago.edu
773-702-9566
Party name: Social Science Scholars
Darin Edward-Wesley Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Howard University School of Law Civil Rights Clinic
2900 Van Ness St. NW
Washington, DC 20008

darin.johnson@law.howard.edu
202 807 8067
Party name: Howard University School of Law Civil Rights Clinic, et al.
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
1250 Connecticut Avenue
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20036

lj@larryjoseph.com
202-355-9452
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund
Roberta A Kaplan
    Counsel of Record
Kaplan & Company, LLP
350 Fifth Avenue, Suite 7110
New York, NY 10118

rkaplan@kaplanandcompany.com
(212)-763-0883
Party name: Constitutional Law Scholars Corey Brettschneider, et al.
Peter Karanjia
    Counsel of Record
Davis, Wright, Tremaine, LLP
1919 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

peterkaranjia@dwt.com
(202)-973-4256
Party name: Members of Congress
Richard Brian Katskee
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Separation of Church and State
1310 L Street, NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20005

katskee@au.org
(202)-466-3234
Party name: Members of the Clergy, et al.
John W Keker
    Counsel of Record
Keker, Van Nest & Peters, LLP
633 Battery Street
San Francisco, CA 94111

jkeker@keker.com
415-391- 5400
Party name: Khizr Khan
Scott A Keller
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

scott.keller@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Texas, et al.
James Wayne Kim
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery LLP
500 North Capitol Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

jakim@mwe.com
(202)-756-8195
Party name: The National Asian Pacific American Bar Association, et al.
Kenneth Alan Klukowski
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Rights Union
3213 Duke Street #625
Alexandria, VA 22314

kklukowski@theacru.org
877-730-2278
Party name: American Civil Rights Union
Harold Hongju Koh
    Counsel of Record
Rule of Law Clinic, Yale Law School
127 Wall Street
New Haven, CT 06520-8215

harold.koh@ylsclinics.org
203-432-4932
Party name: Former National Security Officials
Vincent Gregory Levy
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP
750 Seventh Avenue, 26th Floor
New York, NY 10019

vlevy@hsgllp.com
646-837-5151
Party name: Syrian Asylee Ahmad M.
Joshua Seth Lipshutz
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
Suite 3000
Los Angeles, CA 90071

jlipshutz@gibsondunn.com
213-229-7000
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al.
David Yury Livshiz
    Counsel of Record
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer, US, LLP
601 Lexington Avenue, 31stFloor
New York, NY 10022

david.livshiz@freshfields.com
212-277-4000
Party name: Cato Institute
Robert Mark Loeb
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

rloeb@orrick.com
(202)-339-8400
Party name: Executive Branch Officials
Robert Allen Long Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
850 Tenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001-4956

rlong@cov.com
(202) 662-6000
Party name: Interfaith Coalition
Jonathan David Lubin
    Counsel of Record
1601 Sherman Ave., Suite 520
Evanston, IL 60201

jonathan@lubinlegal.com
773-954-2608
Party name: Decalogue Society of Lawyers
Adam S. Lurie
    Counsel of Record
Linklaters, LLP
601 13th St., Suite 400 South
Washington, DC 20005

adam.lurie@linklaters.com
(202)-654-9200
Party name: American Jewish Committee
Rebecca Susan Markert
    Counsel of Record
Freedom from Religion Foundation
P.O. Box 750
Madison, WI 53701

rmarkert@ffrf.org
608-256-8900
Party name: Freedom from Religion Foundation
Kevin Paul Martin
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
100 Northern Avenue
Boston, MA 02210

kmartin@goodwinlaw.com
(617) 570-1000
Party name: The Foundation for the Children of Ian, et al.
Anna-Rose Mathieson
    Counsel of Record
California Appellate Law Group LLP
96 Jessie Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

annarose@calapplaw.com
415-649-6700
Party name: Scholars of Mormon History & Law in support of neither party
Erin Elizabeth Mersino
    Counsel of Record
Great Lakes Justice Center
5600 W. Mount Hope Hwy.
Lansing, MI 48917

contact@greatlakesjc.org
517-322-3207
Party name: American Legislators in Support of Judicial Restraint
Alice Margaret O'Brien
    Counsel of Record
National Eduction Association
1201 16th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

aobrien@nea.org
202 822 7035
Party name: National Education Association
Steven E. Obus
    Counsel of Record
Proskauer Rose LLP
11 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

sobus@proskauer.com
(212) 969-3000
Party name: New York University
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180-5615

wjo@mindspring.com
703-356-5070
Party name: Citizens United, et al.
Antonio Jorge Perez-Marques
    Counsel of Record
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
450 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

antonio.perez@davispolk.com
212-450-4000
Party name: Association of Art Museum Directors, et al.
Mary Kelly Persyn
    Counsel of Record
Persyn Law & Policy
912 Cole Street, PMB 124
San Francisco, CA 94117

marykelly@persynlaw.com
628 400-1254
Party name: American Professional Society on the Abuse of Children
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown, LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: 161 Technology Companies
Michael William Price
    Counsel of Record
Brennan Center for Justice at NY University School of Law
120 Broadway, Suite 1750
New York, NY 10271

michael.price@nyu.edu
(646) 292-8335
Party name: Hussam Ayloush, et al.
Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
1444 I. Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

aquereshi@naacpldf.org
2026821300
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
Mark Leonard Rienzi
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1200 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

mrienzi@becketlaw.org
202-955-0095
Party name: Becket Fund for Religious Liberty in support of neither party
Joshua David Rogaczewski
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery LLP
500 N. Capitol Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

jrogaczewski@mwe.com
202-756-8000
Party name: The Association of American Medical Colleges, et al.
Fred Anthony Rowley
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson, LLP
350 South Grand Avenue
Fiftieth Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

fred.rowley@mto.com
213-683-9100
Party name: Professors of Federal Courts Jurisprudence, Constitutional Law and Immigration Law
Bradford Jay Sandler
    Counsel of Record
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones
10100 Santa Monica Blvd., Suite 1300
Los Angeles, CA 90067

bsandler@pszjlaw.com
310 277 6910
Party name: National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees
Kent Stephen Scheidegger
    Counsel of Record
Criminal Justice Legal Fdn.
2131 L Street
Sacramento, CA 95816

briefs@cjlf.org
916-446-0345
Party name: The Criminal Justice Legal Foundation in support of neither party
Michael Ramsey Scott
    Counsel of Record
Hillis Clark Martin & Peterson, P.S.
999 Third Avenue, Suite 4600
Seattle, WA 98104

michael.scott@hcmp.com
206-623-1745
Party name: Episcopal Bishops
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
(202) 546-8890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin, Gump, Strauss, Hauer & Feld, LLP
1333 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4000
Party name: Karen Korematsu, et al.
Benjamin Gross Shatz
    Counsel of Record
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
11355 West Olympic Boulevard
Los Angles, CA 90064

bshatz@manatt.com
(310)-312-4000
Party name: Muslim Justice League, et al.
Ethan G. Shenkman
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ethan.shenkman@apks.com
202-942-5000
Party name: National Congress of American Indians
Deborah Lynn Smith
    Counsel of Record
Service Employees International Union
1800 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

debbie.smith@seiu.org
202-730-7168
Party name: International Labor Organizations
Benna Ruth Solomon
    Counsel of Record
Corporation Counsel of the City of Chicago
30 N. LaSalle St., Ste. 800
Chicago, IL 60602

benna.solomon@cityofchicago.org
312-744-7764
Party name: Chicago, Los Angeles, et al.
Ilya Somin
    Counsel of Record
Professor of Law, George Mason University
3301 Fairfax Dr.
Arlington, VA 22201

isomin@gmu.edu
(703)-993-8069
Party name: Constitutional Law Scholars Gabriel "Jack" Chin, et al.
Ellyde Roko Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Quinn, Emanuel, Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Avenue, 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10010

ellydethompson@quinnemanuel.com
212-849-7000
Party name: Port of Seattle
Alan Craig Turner
    Counsel of Record
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

aturner@stblaw.com
212-455-2000
Party name: Certain Immigrant Rights Organizations
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
120 Broadway
New York, NY 10271-0332

(212) 416-8962
Party name: States of New York, et al.,
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

(202) 663-6000
Party name: Scholars of Federal Jurisdiction
Victor Keith Williams
    Counsel of Record
America First Lawyers Association
5209 Baltimore Ave.
Bethesda, MD 20816

americafirstlawyers@gmail.com
(301) 951-9045
Party name: Professor Victor Williams
Scott Lewis Winkelman
    Counsel of Record
Crowell & Moring, LLP
1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

swinkelman@crowell.com
202-624-2500
Party name: Tahirih Justice Center, et al.
Christopher J. Wright
    Counsel of Record
Harris, Wiltshire & Grannis, LLP
1919 M Street, NW, Fl. 8
Washington, DC 20036

cwright@hwglaw.com
(202)-730-1300
Party name: American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
David Eliezer Yerushalmi
    Counsel of Record
American Freedom Law Center
2020 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 189
Washington, DC 20006

dyerushalmi@americanfreedomlawcenter.org
(646)-262-0500
Party name: National Security Experts Andrew C. McCarthy, et al.
Barnaby W. Zall
    Counsel of Record
685 Spring St. #314
Friday Harbor, WA 98250

bzall@bzall.com
360-378-6600
Party name: Public Policy Legal Institute and Center for Competitive Politics in support of neither party
Nathan LewinLewin & Lewin, LLP
888 17th Street, NW
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

nat@lewinlewin.com
(202) 828-1000
Party name: Susan Abeles
Herbert W. TitusWilliam J. Olson, PC
370 Maple Avenue West
Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180 - 5615

wjo@mindspring.com
(703) 356-5070
Party name: Citizens United, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543