Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1423
RSS Feed Print
No. 16-1423
Title:Keanu D. W. Ortiz, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 30, 2017
Linked with 16A1034
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(16-0671)
   Decision Date:February 9, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 21 2017Application (16A1034) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 10, 2017 to June 9, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Apr 26 2017Application (16A1034) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 9, 2017.
May 19 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 29, 2017)
Jun 26 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 31, 2017.
Jul 27 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including August 18, 2017.
Aug 18 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Aug 30 2017Reply of petitioner Keanu D. W. Ortiz filed.
Sep 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Sep 28 2017Petition GRANTED, and the petitions for writs of certiorari in Nos. 16-961 and 16-1017 are granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. In addition to the questions presented by the petitions, the parties are directed to brief and argue the following question: Whether this Court has jurisdiction to review the cases in Nos. 16-961 and 16-1017 under 28 U. S. C. ยง 1259(3).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stephen I. Vladeck
    Counsel of Record
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

svladeck@law.utexas.edu
(512) 475-9198
Party name: Keanu D. W. Ortiz
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543