Docket for 16-1422
|
May 24 2017 | Petition for a writ of mandamus filed. (Response due June 29, 2017) | | | May 24 2017 | Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of mandamus filed by petitioner. | | | Jun 06 2017 | Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017. | | | Jun 26 2017 | Motion to expedite consideration filed by petitioner DENIED. | | | Jun 27 2017 | Application (17A26) for a stay of proceedings pending disposition of the petition for a writ of mandamus, submitted to Justice Kennedy. | | | Jun 29 2017 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | | Jul 05 2017 | Application (17A26) denied by Justice Kennedy. | | | Jul 11 2017 | Reply of petitioner filed. | | | Jul 19 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017. | | | Aug 16 2017 | Supplemental brief of petitioner In Re: Joseph M. Arpaio filed. (Distributed) | | | Sep 20 2017 | Second supplemental brief of petitioner In Re: Joseph M. Arpaio filed. (Distributed) | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|