Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1415
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-1415
Title:Jill M. Alban, et al., Petitioners
v.
Nippon Yusen Kabushiki Kaisha, et al.
Docketed:May 26, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3353, 15-3354, 15-3355)
   Decision Date:January 18, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:February 22, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 23 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 26, 2017)
Jun 01 2017Waiver of right of respondents Nippon Yusen Kabushiki Kaisha, et al. to respond filed.
Jun 14 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Oct 02 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
E. Lawrence Vincent
    Counsel of Record
Burns Charest LLP
900 Jackson Street, Suite 500
Dallas, TX 75202

lvincent@burnscharest.com
(469) 904-4550
Party name: Jill M. Alban, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Roberto Andres Rivera-Soto
    Counsel of Record
Ballard Spahr, LLP
210 Lake Drive East
Suite 200
Cherry Hill, NJ 08002-1163

(856) 761-3416
Party name: Nippon Yusen Kabushiki Kaisha, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543