Docket for 16-1413
|
May 25 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 26, 2017) | | | Jun 21 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 26, 2017. | | | Jul 13 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including August 25, 2017. | | | Aug 25 2017 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | | Sep 13 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017. | | | Sep 13 2017 | Reply of petitioner Donald L.Blankenship filed. (Distributed) | | | Oct 10 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|