Docket for 16-1400
|
May 24 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 23, 2017) | | | Jun 26 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 24, 2017. | | | Jul 24 2017 | Brief of respondent Department of the Navy in opposition filed. | | | Aug 09 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|