Docket for 16-1369
 | |
|
Mar 07 2017 | Application (16A885) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 9, 2017 to May 10, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy. | | | Mar 10 2017 | Application (16A885) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until May 10, 2017. | | | May 10 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 15, 2017) | | | May 22 2017 | Waiver of right of respondents Sandra L. Bahr, et al. to respond filed. | | | Jun 09 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 17, 2017. | | | Jun 15 2017 | Brief amici curiae of South Coast Air Quality Management District, et al. filed. | | | Jul 13 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including August 29, 2017. | | | Aug 29 2017 | Brief of Federal Respondents in opposition filed. | | | Sep 08 2017 | Reply of petitioner Arizona filed. | | | Sep 13 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017. | | | Sep 26 2017 | Response Requested. (Due October 26, 2017) | | | Oct 12 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 30, 2017. | | | Nov 30 2017 | Brief of respondents Sandra L. Bahr, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Dec 18 2017 | Reply of petitioner Arizona filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 20 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018. | | | Jan 08 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|