Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1359
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-1359
Title:Reuven Gilmore, Individually, as the Administrator of the Estate of Esh Kodesh Gilmore and as Natural Guardian of Plaintiffs Eliana Gilmore and Dror Gilmore, et al., Petitioners
v.
Palestinian Interim Self-Government Authority, et al.
Docketed:May 11, 2017
Linked with 16A838
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-7129)
   Decision Date:December 13, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 23 2017Application (16A838) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 13, 2017 to April 27, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Feb 24 2017Application (16A838) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until April 27, 2017.
Apr 27 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 12, 2017)
May 15 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 12, 2017.
Jul 12 2017Brief of respondents Palestinian Interim Self-Government Authority, et al. in opposition filed.
Jul 26 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Jul 27 2017Reply of petitioners Reuven Gilmore, Individually, as the Administrator of the Estate of Esh Kodesh Gilmore and as Natural Guardian of Plaintiffs Eliana Gilmore and Dror Gilmore, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 02 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Asher Perlin
    Counsel of Record
4600 Sheridan St., Suite 303
Hollywood, FL 33021

asher@asherperlin.com
954-284-0900
Party name: ReuvenGilmore, et al.
Asher Perlin4600 Sheridan St.
Suite 303
Hollywood, FL 33021

asher@asherperlin.com
(954) 284-0900
Party name: Reuven Gilmore, Individually, as the Administrator of the Estate of Esh Kodesh Gilmore and as Natural Guardian of Plaintiffs Eliana Gilmore and Dror Gilmore, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Gassan A. Baloul
    Counsel of Record
Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP
2550 M Street, NW
Washington, DC 20037

gassan.baloul@squirepb.com
(202) 457-6000
Party name: Palestinian Interim Self-Government Authority, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543