Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1356
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-1356
Title:Anthony Piszel, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 9, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-5100)
   Decision Date:August 18, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:February 8, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 09 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 8, 2017)
Jun 02 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 10, 2017.
Jun 08 2017Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Jul 03 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including August 9, 2017.
Aug 09 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Aug 22 2017Reply of petitioner Anthony Piszel filed.
Aug 23 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Oct 02 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William Edward Donnelly
    Counsel of Record
555 13th Street, NW, Suite 410
Washington, DC 20004

wdonnelly@mmlawus.com
202-661-7011
Party name: Anthony Piszel
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
David G. CabralesGardere Wynne Sewell LLP
2021 McKinney Avenue, Ste. 1600
Dallas, TX 75201

dcabrales@gardere.com
(214) 999-3000
Party name: Cato Institute, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543