Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1351
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-1351
Title:Board of County Commissioners of Otero County, New Mexico, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 8, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-2210)
   Decision Date:December 8, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:February 3, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 01 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 7, 2017)
Jun 06 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 7, 2017.
Jul 06 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Jul 19 2017Reply of petitioner Board of County Commissioners of Otero County, New Mexico filed.
Jul 26 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Oct 02 2017Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard L. C. Virtue
    Counsel of Record
Virtue & Najjar, PC
2200 Brothers Road, 2nd Floor
P.O. Box 22249
Santa Fe, NM 87505

rvirtue@virtuelaw.com
(505) 983-6101
Party name: Board of County Commissioners of Otero County, New Mexico
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543