Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1346
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-1346
Title:Andrew U. D. Straw, Petitioner
v.
Indiana Supreme Court
Docketed:May 8, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Indiana
   Case Numbers:(98S00-1601-DI-12)
   Decision Date:February 17, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 04 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 7, 2017)
May 19 2017Letter of petitioner received May 24, 2017.
May 24 2017Waiver of right of respondent Indiana Supreme Court to respond filed.
Jun 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017.
Jun 26 2017Petition DENIED.
Jul 11 2017Petition for Rehearing filed.
Jul 11 2017Motion for leave to proceed further herein in forma pauperis filed by petitioner.
Sep 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Oct 10 2017Rehearing DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew U. D. Straw1900 E. Golf Road, Suite 950A
Schaumburg, IL 60173

andrew@andrewstraw.com
(312) 985-7333
Party name: Andrew U. D. Straw
Attorneys for Respondent
Stephen Richard Creason
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Indiana Govt. Center South 5th Fl.
302 West Washington St
Indianapolis, IN 46204

steve.creason@atg.in.gov
(317) 232-6201
Party name: Indiana Supreme Court

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543