Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1324
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-1324
Title:Christine J. Williams, Petitioner
v.
Poarch Band of Creek Indians
Docketed:May 4, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-13552)
   Decision Date:October 18, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:December 8, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 01 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 5, 2017)
Jun 02 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 5, 2017.
Jun 29 2017Waiver of right of respondent Poarch Band of Creek Indians to respond filed.
Jul 19 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Oct 02 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Christine J. Williams1662 Woods Road
Atmore, AL 36502

(251) 583-6923
Party name: Christine J. Williams
Attorneys for Respondent
James Carey Pennington
    Counsel of Record
417 North 20th Street Suite 1700
Birmingham, AL 35203

Party name: Poarch Band of Creek Indians
M. Tae Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
420 20th Street North, Suite 1900
Birmingham, AL 35203

tae.phillips@ogletree.com
(205) 328-1900
Party name: Poarch Band of Creek Indians

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543