Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1320
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-1320
Vide 17-8
Title:Upstate Citizens for Equality, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:May 2, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1688, 15-1726)
   Decision Date:November 9, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:January 27, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 26 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 1, 2017)
May 30 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 3, 2017.
Jun 30 2017Brief of respondents United States, et al. in opposition filed.
Jul 19 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Sep 21 2017Rescheduled.
Oct 02 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Oct 03 2017Rescheduled.
Oct 10 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017.
Oct 11 2017Rescheduled.
Oct 23 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.
Oct 24 2017Rescheduled.
Oct 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2017.
Nov 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2017.
Nov 13 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/21/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David Brown Vickers
    Counsel of Record
244 Salt Springs Street
Fayetteville, NY 13066

vickersd@earthlink.net
315-637-5130
Party name: Upstate Citizens for Equality, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543