Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1309
RSS Feed Print
No. 16-1309
Title:S.G.E. Management, L.L.C., et al., Petitioners
v.
Juan Ramon Torres, et al.
Docketed:May 2, 2017
Linked with 16A788
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-20128)
   Decision Date:September 30, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:November 29, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 02 2017Application (16A788) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 27, 2017 to March 29, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Feb 15 2017Application (16A788) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 29, 2017.
Mar 06 2017Application (16A788) to extend further the time from March 29, 2017 to April 28, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Mar 07 2017Application (16A788) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until April 28, 2017.
Apr 28 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 1, 2017)
May 08 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioners.
May 23 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 24, 2017.
May 31 2017Brief amicus curiae of Professor Mark Moller filed.
Jun 01 2017Brief amici curiae of Independent Associates filed.
Jun 01 2017Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Jul 24 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including July 27, 2017.
Jul 27 2017Brief of respondents Juan R. Torres, et al. in opposition filed.
Aug 14 2017Reply of petitioners S.G.E. Management, et al. filed.
Aug 16 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Oct 02 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
James C. Ho
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
2100 McKinney Ave., Suite 1100
Dallas, TX 75201

jho@gibsondunn.com
(214)-698-3100
Party name: S.G.E. Management, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Eric F. Citron
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

eric.citron@wilmerhale.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Juan R. Torres, et al.
Other
C. Kevin MarshallJones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

ckmarshall@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Cato Institute
Aaron M. StreettBaker Botts, L.L.P.
910 Louisiana Street
Houston, TX 77002

aaron.streett@bakerbotts.com
(713) 229-1855
Party name: Professor Mark Moller
James Patrick SullivanKing & Spalding LLP
401 Congress, Suite 3200
Austin, TX 78701

jsullivan@KSLAW.com
(512) 457-2014
Party name: Independent Associates

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543