Docket for 16-1307
 | |
|
Jan 27 2017 | Application (16A770) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 26, 2017 to March 28, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | | Feb 02 2017 | Application (16A770) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 28, 2017. | | | Mar 28 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 31, 2017) | | | Mar 28 2017 | Appendix of Ali Hamza Ahmad Suliman al Bahlul filed. | | | May 24 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 30, 2017. | | | May 30 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of Justice Richard J. Goldstone filed. | | | May 31 2017 | Brief amici curiae of International and Constitutional Law Experts filed. | | | May 31 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of National Institute of Military Justice filed. | | | May 31 2017 | Brief amici curiae of United States Council of Muslim Organizations, et al., filed. | | | May 31 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Rights filed. | | | May 31 2017 | Brief amici curiae of Karen Korematsu, et al. filed. | | | May 31 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of Professor Jens David Ohlin filed. | | | May 31 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of Mr. Ammar al Baluchi filed. | | | Jun 30 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including July 31, 2017. | | | Jul 25 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including August 30, 2017. | | | Aug 28 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 6, 2017. | | | Sep 06 2017 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | | Sep 19 2017 | Reply of petitioner Ali Hamza Ahmad Suliman al Bahlul filed. | | | Sep 20 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017. | | | Oct 10 2017 | Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. | | |
|