Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1305
RSS Feed Print
No. 16-1305
Title:Gregory Nies, et ux., Petitioners
v.
Town of Emerald Isle, North Carolina
Docketed:April 28, 2017
Linked with 16A812
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of North Carolina
   Case Numbers:(COA15-169)
   Decision Date:November 17, 2015
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:December 14, 2016
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 10 2017Application (16A812) to extend the time to file a jurisdictional statement on appeal from March 14, 2017 to April 28, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Feb 15 2017Application (16A812) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until April 28, 2017.
Apr 26 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 30, 2017)
May 23 2017Waiver of right of respondent Town of Emerald Isle, North Carolina to respond filed.
May 30 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Owners' Counsel of America, et al.
Jun 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017.
Jun 12 2017Response Requested. (Due July 12, 2017)
Jun 22 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 14, 2017.
Aug 11 2017Brief of respondent Town of Emerald Isle in opposition filed.
Aug 23 2017Reply of petitioners Gregory P. Nies and Diane S. Nies filed.
Aug 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Oct 02 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Owners' Counsel of America, et al. GRANTED.
Oct 02 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
J. David Breemer
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation 930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

jdb@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Gregory P. Nies and Diane S. Nies
Attorneys for Respondent
Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
    Counsel of Record
Deutsch Hunt, PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave., NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

rdeutsch@deutschhunt.com
(202-868-6915
Party name: Town of Emerald Isle
Brian Edwin EdesCrossley McIntosh Collier Hanley & Edes, PPLC
5002 Randall Parkway
Wilmington, NC 28403

briane@cmclawfirm.com
910-762-9711
Party name: Town of Emerald Isle, North Carolina
Other
Robert H. Thomas
    Counsel of Record
Damon Key Leong Kupchak Hastert
1003 Bishop Street
16th Floor
Honolulu, HI 96813

rht@hawaiilawyer.com
808-531-8031
Party name: Owners' Counsel of America, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543