Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1303
RSS Feed Print
No. 16-1303
Title:Solidfx, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Jeppesen Sanderson, Inc.
Docketed:April 28, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1079, 15-1097)
   Decision Date:October 31, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:January 25, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 25 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 30, 2017)
May 02 2017Waiver of right of respondent Jeppesen Sanderson, Inc. to respond filed.
May 09 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 25, 2017.
May 16 2017Response Requested. (Due June 15, 2017)
May 30 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 17, 2017.
Jul 17 2017Brief of respondent Jeppesen Sanderson, Inc. in opposition filed.
Jul 31 2017Reply of petitioner Solidfx, LLC filed.
Aug 02 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Oct 02 2017Petition DENIED. Justice Alito and Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Shannon Wells Stevenson
    Counsel of Record
1550 Seventeenth Street
Suite 500
Denver, CO 80202

Shannon.Stevenson@dgslaw.com
(303)-892-7328
Party name: Solidfx, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Jason Michael Wilcox
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis, LLP
655 Fifteenth Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

jason.wilcox@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: Jeppesen Sanderson, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543