Docket for 16-1301
|
Mar 15 2017 | Application (16A904) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 27, 2017 to May 6, 2017, submitted to Justice Alito. | | | Mar 20 2017 | Application (16A904) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until April 26, 2017. | | | Apr 26 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 31, 2017) | | | May 24 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 30, 2017. | | | Jun 22 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including July 6, 2017. | | | Jul 06 2017 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | | Jul 20 2017 | Reply of petitioner Kirtish Patel filed. | | | Jul 26 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|