Docket for 16-1276
 | |
|
Apr 25 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 25, 2017) | | | May 03 2017 | Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the Respondent. | | | May 08 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 30, 2017. | | | May 10 2017 | Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner. | | | May 24 2017 | Brief amici curiae of New England Legal Foundation, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | | May 25 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. (Distributed) | | | May 25 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar filed. (Distributed) | | | May 25 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of Lime Energy Services Company filed. (Distributed) | | | May 26 2017 | Letter of May 26, 2017, from counsel for petitioner waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 received. | | | May 30 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 15, 2017. | | | May 30 2017 | Brief of respondent Paul Somers in opposition filed. (Distributed) | | | Jun 02 2017 | Reply of petitioner Digital Realty Trust, Inc. filed. (Distributed) | | | Jun 19 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017. | | | Jun 26 2017 | Petition GRANTED. | | | Jul 06 2017 | Consent the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner. | | | Jul 12 2017 | The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 24, 2017. | | | Jul 12 2017 | The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 10, 2017. | | | Jul 12 2017 | Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Digital Realty Trust, Inc. | | | Jul 18 2017 | Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondent. | | | Aug 24 2017 | Brief of petitioner Digital Realty Trust, Inc. filed. | | | Aug 25 2017 | Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED. | | | Aug 25 2017 | Brief amici curiae of New England Legal Foundation, et al. filed. | | | Aug 31 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of The Center for Workplace Compliance filed. | | | Aug 31 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed. | | | Aug 31 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. | | | Aug 31 2017 | Brief amici curiae of Lime Energy Services Company and Prestige Cruises International filed. | | | Oct 06 2017 | SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, November 28, 2017. | | | Oct 10 2017 | Brief of respondent Paul Somers filed. | | | Oct 11 2017 | Motion to argue pro hac vice filed by the Solicitor General. | | | Oct 12 2017 | CIRCULATED | | | Oct 17 2017 | Brief amici curiae of National Whistleblower Center, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | | Oct 17 2017 | Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed. | | | Oct 17 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of Senator Charles Grassley filed. (Distributed) | | | Oct 17 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Distributed) | | | Oct 17 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of Ethical Systems, Inc. filed. (Distributed) | | | Oct 17 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of Taxpayers Against Fraud Education Fund filed. (Distributed) | | | Oct 18 2017 | Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit. | | | Oct 18 2017 | Record received from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER. | | | Nov 06 2017 | Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. | | | Nov 06 2017 | Motion to argue pro hac vice filed by the Solicitor General GRANTED. | | | Nov 09 2017 | Reply of petitioner Digital Realty Trust, Inc. filed. (Distributed) | | | Nov 28 2017 | Argued. For petitioner: Kannon K. Shanmugam, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Daniel L. Geyser, Dallas, Tex.; and Christopher G. Michel, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (Pro hac vice; for United States, as amicus curiae.) | | | Feb 21 2018 | Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Ginsburg, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Kennedy, Breyer, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Sotomayor, J., filed a concurring opinion, in which Breyer, J., joined. Thomas, J., filed an opinion concurring in part and concurring in the judgment, in which Alito and Gorsuch, JJ., joined. | | | Mar 26 2018 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. | | |
|