Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1265
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-1265
Title:Nijjar Realty, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Germaine Judge, et al.
Docketed:April 21, 2017
Linked with 16A827
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(B267694)
   Decision Date:August 15, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:November 30, 2016
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 17 2017Application (16A827) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 28, 2017 to April 29, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Feb 22 2017Application (16A827) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until April 29, 2017.
Apr 18 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 22, 2017)
Jun 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017.
Jun 08 2017Response Requested. (Due July 10, 2017)
Jul 06 2017Brief of respondent Germaine Judge in opposition filed.
Jul 24 2017Reply of petitioners Nijjar Realty, et al. filed.
Jul 26 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Oct 02 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Ronald Wayne Novotny
    Counsel of Record
Atkinson, Andelson, Loya, Ruud & Romo
12800 Center Court Drive, Suite 300
Cerritos, CA 90703

rnovotny@aalrr.com
(562) 653-3200
Party name: Nijjar Realty, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Lonnie C. Blanchard III.
    Counsel of Record
The Blanchard Law Group, APC
3311 East Pico Blvd.
Los Angeles, CA 90023

lonnieblanchard@gmail.com
(213) 599-8255
Party name: Germaine Judge, et al.
Peter R. Dion-Kindem
    Counsel of Record
Peter R. Dion-Kindem
21550 Oxnard Street, Suite 900
Woodland Hills, CA 91367

peter@dion-kindemlaw.com
(818) 883-4900
Party name: Germaine Judge

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543