Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1259
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-1259
Title:Antonio Farias, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 20, 2017
Linked with 16A869
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-15804)
   Decision Date:September 1, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:December 19, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 28 2017Application (16A869) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 19, 2017 to April 18, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Mar 07 2017Application (16A869) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until April 18, 2017.
Apr 18 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 22, 2017)
Apr 25 2017Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
May 02 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 18, 2017.
May 15 2017Response Requested. (Due June 14, 2017)
Jun 08 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 14, 2017.
Jul 13 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Jul 31 2017Reply of petitioner Antonio Farias filed. (Distributed)
Aug 02 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Oct 02 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard C. Klugh
    Counsel of Record
Ingraham Building
25 S.E. Second Ave., Suite 1100
Miami, FL 33131

(305)-536-1191
Party name: AntonioFarias
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543