Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1239
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-1239
Title:Rothe Development, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Department of Defense, et al.
Docketed:April 17, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-5176)
   Decision Date:September 9, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:January 13, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 13 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 17, 2017)
May 10 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 16, 2017.
May 17 2017Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Jun 07 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including July 17, 2017.
Jul 07 2017Brief of Federal respondent in opposition filed.
Jul 25 2017Reply of petitioner Rothe Development, Inc. filed. (Distributed).
Jul 26 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Sep 21 2017Rescheduled.
Oct 02 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Oct 03 2017Rescheduled.
Oct 10 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017.
Oct 16 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Steven J. Lechner
    Counsel of Record
Mountain States Legal Foundation
2596 South Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO 80227

lechner@mountainstateslegal.com
(303) 292-2021
Party name: Rothe Development, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Defense, et al.
Other
Meriem L. HubbardPacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

mlh@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543