Docket for 16-1231
|
Apr 11 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 15, 2017) | | | May 10 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 14, 2017. | | | Jun 14 2017 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | | Jun 26 2017 | Reply of petitioner Anthony Douglas Elonis filed. (Distributed) | | | Jun 28 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|