Docket for 16-1200
|
Dec 29 2016 | Application (16A661) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 1, 2017 to April 2, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy. | | | Jan 05 2017 | Application (16A661) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until April 2, 2017. | | | Apr 03 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 5, 2017) | | | Apr 07 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. | | | Apr 12 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 28, 2017. | | | Apr 20 2017 | Response Requested. (Due May 22, 2017) | | | May 17 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 21, 2017. | | | Jun 21 2017 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | | Jun 30 2017 | Reply of petitioner Hoda Samuel filed. (Distributed) | | | Jul 05 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|