Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1197
RSS Feed Print
No. 16-1197
Title:QinetiQ U.S. Holdings, Inc. and Subsidiaries, Petitioner
v.
Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Docketed:April 4, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-2192)
   Decision Date:January 6, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 04 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 4, 2017)
Apr 19 2017Waiver of right of respondent Commissioner of Internal Revenue to respond filed.
Apr 25 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2017.
Apr 28 2017Response Requested. (Due May 30, 2017)
May 24 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 29, 2017.
Jun 29 2017Brief of respondent Commissioner of Internal Revenue in opposition filed.
Jul 18 2017Reply of petitioner QinetiQ U.S. Holdings, Inc. & Subsidiaries filed.
Jul 19 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Oct 02 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory G. Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 11th Street, N.W.
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
(202) 637-2207
Party name: QinetiQ U.S. Holdings, Inc. & Subsidiaries
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Commissioner of Internal Revenue

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543