Docket for 16-1190
|
Mar 30 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 3, 2017) | | | Apr 26 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 2, 2017. | | | May 25 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including July 3, 2017. | | | Jul 03 2017 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | | Jul 13 2017 | Reply of petitioner Michael Davis filed. | | | Jul 19 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|