Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1150
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-1150
Title:Elsa Hall, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ethlyn Louise Hall and as Successor Trustee of the Ethlyn Louise Hall Family Trust, Petitioner
v.
Samuel Hall, et al.
Docketed:March 23, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1564)
   Decision Date:February 10, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 17 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 24, 2017)
Apr 20 2017Waiver of right of respondents Samuel Hall, Jr. and Hall & Griffith, P.C. to respond filed.
May 09 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 25, 2017.
May 15 2017Response Requested. (Due June 14, 2017)
Jun 14 2017Brief of respondents Samuel Hall, Jr. and Hall & Griffith, P.C. in opposition filed.
Jun 28 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Jul 11 2017Reply of petitioner Elsa Hall, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ethlyn Louise Hall and as Successor Trustee of the Ethlyn Louise Hall Family Trust filed. (Distributed)
Sep 28 2017Petition GRANTED.
Nov 13 2017Brief of petitioner Elsa Hall filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2017Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 17 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, January 16, 2018
Nov 22 2017CIRCULATERD.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew C Simpson
    Counsel of Record
Andrew C Simpson, PC
2191 Church street
Ste 5
Christiansted, VI 00820

asimpson@coralbrief.com
3407193900
Party name: Elsa Hall
Attorneys for Respondents
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

202-637-5600
Party name: Samuel Hall, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543