Docket for 16-1149
|
Mar 20 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 21, 2017) | | | Mar 31 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. | | | Apr 05 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 21, 2017. | | | Apr 17 2017 | Response Requested. (Due May 17, 2017) | | | May 16 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 16, 2017. | | | Jun 15 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including June 23, 2017. | | | Jun 23 2017 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | | Jul 12 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017. | | | Sep 11 2017 | Reply of petitioner Paul M.Daugerdas filed. (Distributed) | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|